Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 12/05/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 12/05/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/11/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/11/2014