Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/02/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 12/12/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/11/2014