Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 12/02/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/11/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/24/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/10/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/15/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/16/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/18/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/12/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/12/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/12/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 12/03/2014