Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 12/05/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 12/05/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 12/05/2013
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/09/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/11/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 12/11/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 12/11/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 12/11/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/11/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 12/11/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/11/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 12/11/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 12/11/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 12/11/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 12/11/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 12/11/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/12/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/12/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/07/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/07/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 01/08/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 01/08/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 01/15/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/25/2014