Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/12/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 12/12/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/09/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/09/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 01/13/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 04/07/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 04/29/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/09/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/16/2014