Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 12/12/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/07/2014
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 01/13/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 04/07/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 04/29/2014