Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/12/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 12/12/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 12/12/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/07/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/29/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 05/08/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/16/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 07/16/2014