Refine your search

Refined by:

Alabama Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 01/09/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 01/17/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/04/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/11/2014