There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting the democratic and European aspirations of the people of Ukraine, and their right to choose their own future free of intimidation and fear.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
02/10/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 381 - 2 (Roll no. 56).(text: CR H1693)
12/16/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date
02/10/2014-7:08pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 381 - 2 (Roll no. 56). (text: CR H1693)
02/10/2014-7:00pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1698-1699)
02/10/2014-6:26pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
02/10/2014-5:52pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 447.
02/10/2014-5:52pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1693-1697)
02/10/2014-5:52pmMr. Smith (NJ) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
01/29/2014Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
01/29/2014Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
01/10/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats.
12/16/2013Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
12/16/2013Introduced in House

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 12/16/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 12/16/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 12/16/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 12/16/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 12/16/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 12/19/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 01/27/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/27/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 01/27/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/27/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 01/27/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 01/27/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 01/27/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 01/27/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/27/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 01/27/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 01/27/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 01/27/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 01/27/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/27/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 01/27/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/27/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 01/27/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/28/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/28/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 01/28/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 01/28/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/28/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 01/28/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/28/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 01/28/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/28/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 01/28/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/28/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/28/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 01/28/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 01/29/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 01/29/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 01/31/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 02/03/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/04/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/10/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/10/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs12/16/2013 Referred to
01/29/2014 Markup by
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats01/10/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.447.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.447. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (02/10/2014)

Values the close relationship the United States has established with Ukraine.

Supports the democratic and European aspirations of the people of Ukraine.

Calls on the United States and the European Union (EU) to work together to support a peaceful resolution to the political crisis in Ukraine.

Condemns all acts of violence, and calls on the government of Ukraine to bring to justice those responsible for violence against peaceful protesters and to release and drop criminal charges against those detained for peacefully exercising their democratic rights.

Welcomes the repeal by the Ukrainian parliament of most of the anti-democratic measures adopted on January 16, 2014, and urges President Yanukovych to engage in substantive talks with opposition leaders and to take additional steps to de-escalate tensions.

Urges the United States and the EU to make clear to Ukraine's leaders that those who authorize or engage in violence against peaceful protesters will be held personally accountable.

Supports Department of State measures to revoke the visas of several Ukrainians linked to the violence and encourages the Administration to consider additional targeted sanctions against those who authorize or engage in the use of force.

Urges all parties to engage in constructive dialogue to find a peaceful solution to Ukraine's current political and economic crisis.