Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 12/16/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 12/16/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 12/16/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 12/16/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 12/16/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 12/19/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 01/27/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/27/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 01/27/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/27/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 01/27/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 01/27/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 01/27/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 01/27/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/27/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 01/27/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 01/27/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 01/27/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 01/27/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/27/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 01/27/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/27/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 01/27/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/28/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/28/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 01/28/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 01/28/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/28/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 01/28/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/28/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 01/28/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/28/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 01/28/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/28/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/28/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 01/28/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 01/29/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 01/29/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 01/31/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 02/03/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/04/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/10/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/10/2014