Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 01/10/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/27/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/27/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 01/27/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 01/27/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/27/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/27/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/27/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/27/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/27/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 01/27/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/27/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/27/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/31/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/31/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/31/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/31/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 01/31/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/04/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/04/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/04/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 02/04/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/11/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/11/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/11/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/11/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/25/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/25/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/25/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/27/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/04/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 03/04/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/05/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/11/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/24/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/27/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/08/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/08/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 04/08/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/09/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 04/29/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/29/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/29/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/29/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/01/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/01/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 05/01/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/01/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/01/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/06/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/06/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/06/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/19/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/20/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/21/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/21/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/10/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/24/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/25/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/25/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/26/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/26/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/26/2014
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 06/26/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/08/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/08/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/08/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/08/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/08/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 07/09/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/09/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/10/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/11/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/14/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/16/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/17/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/22/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/29/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/29/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/31/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/10/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 09/11/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/18/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/18/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/18/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/12/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 11/13/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 11/13/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/13/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/13/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 11/14/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/04/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 12/04/2014