Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/05/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/05/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/05/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/05/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/05/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/10/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/23/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/23/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/23/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/23/2014