Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 01/25/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 01/25/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 02/01/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 02/01/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/01/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/01/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/04/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 02/13/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/13/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/15/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/15/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/17/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/17/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/17/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/17/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/17/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/17/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 07/17/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/17/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/17/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 07/17/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/17/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/17/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/17/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/17/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/17/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 07/17/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/17/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 07/17/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/17/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/17/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/17/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/17/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/23/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/23/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/23/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/23/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/04/2013