There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Strongly supporting the restoration and protection of State authority and flexibility in establishing and defining challenging student academic standards and assessments, and strongly denouncing the President's coercion of States into adopting the Common Core State Standards by conferring preferences in Federal grants and flexibility waivers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/11/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/11/2014Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
02/11/2014Introduced in House

Cosponsors (72)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 02/11/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/11/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/14/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/14/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/14/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/21/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 02/21/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 02/21/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/21/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 02/21/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/21/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/25/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/25/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 02/27/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/27/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/27/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/04/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/06/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/11/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 03/14/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/26/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 04/01/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/04/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/19/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/17/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 07/29/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce02/11/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.476. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/11/2014)

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that:

  • states and local educational agencies should maintain the right and responsibility of determining educational curricula, programs of instruction, and assessments for elementary and secondary education;
  • the federal government should not incentivize the adoption of common education standards or the creation of a national assessment to align with such standards; and
  • no application process for any federal grant funds or waivers issued by the Secretary of Education under the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 should award any additional points, or provide any preference, for the adoption of the Common Core State Standards or any other national common education standards.