Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 02/11/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/11/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/14/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/14/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/14/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/21/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 02/21/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 02/21/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/21/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 02/21/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/21/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/25/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/25/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 02/27/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/27/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/27/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/04/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/06/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/11/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 03/14/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/26/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 04/01/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/04/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/19/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/17/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 07/29/2014