Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26]* 02/25/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 02/25/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/26/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 02/26/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 02/26/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 02/26/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 02/26/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/27/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/28/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/04/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/04/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/04/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 03/04/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/04/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/04/2014