Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 02/28/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/28/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/28/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/28/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 02/28/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 02/28/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/06/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/11/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 03/11/2014
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/11/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/11/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/11/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/11/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 03/11/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 03/11/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/11/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/11/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/12/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/12/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/12/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 03/12/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/12/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/12/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/13/2014
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/13/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 03/13/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/13/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 03/13/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/13/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/13/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/13/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/13/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/13/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 03/13/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/14/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/14/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/14/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 03/14/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/14/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/14/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/14/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 03/14/2014
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/24/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/24/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/24/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/24/2014
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/24/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/24/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/24/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/24/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 03/24/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/24/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/24/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 03/24/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/24/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/25/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/25/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/25/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 03/25/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/25/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/25/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/26/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/26/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/26/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/26/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/26/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/27/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 03/27/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/27/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/27/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/27/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/27/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 04/01/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/01/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/01/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 04/01/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/01/2014
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/01/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/01/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/02/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/02/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/03/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/03/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/04/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/04/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/07/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/07/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/07/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/08/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 05/06/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 06/17/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/09/2014