Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/28/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/04/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/04/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/19/2013