Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/26/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/26/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/26/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/02/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/02/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/02/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/02/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/02/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/02/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 04/04/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/04/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/04/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/08/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/08/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 04/08/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 04/09/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/09/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/09/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/28/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 04/28/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/01/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/01/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/06/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/06/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/06/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/07/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 05/09/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/09/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/09/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/19/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/28/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/28/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/28/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/28/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/28/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/28/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/28/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 05/30/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/30/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/30/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/30/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/30/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/10/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/10/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/10/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/10/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/10/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/20/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/20/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/20/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/20/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/20/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/25/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/25/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 07/10/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/10/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/14/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/14/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/14/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/28/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 07/31/2014