Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 03/27/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/27/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/27/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/01/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 04/04/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/04/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/28/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/06/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/30/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/08/2014