Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/01/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/01/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 05/01/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/01/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/02/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/02/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/02/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/02/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 05/02/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 05/02/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 05/02/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 05/02/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/02/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/02/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 05/02/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/02/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/02/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 05/02/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/02/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/02/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 05/02/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/02/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/02/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 05/02/2014
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 05/02/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/02/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/02/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/06/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/06/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/06/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/06/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/06/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/06/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/06/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/06/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/06/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/06/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/06/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/06/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/06/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/06/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/06/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 05/07/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 05/07/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/09/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/09/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 05/09/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/09/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/09/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/13/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/13/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/13/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 05/13/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/13/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/13/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 05/20/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/20/2014