Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/01/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 05/01/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/01/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/06/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/07/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/07/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 05/07/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/07/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/07/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/07/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/07/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/07/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/07/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/08/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 05/09/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/09/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/09/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/09/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/09/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/09/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/09/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/09/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 05/09/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/09/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/09/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 05/09/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/13/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/19/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/19/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/19/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/29/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 06/10/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/11/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/25/2014