Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 05/06/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/07/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 05/07/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/07/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/07/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/07/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/07/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/08/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/08/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/08/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/09/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/22/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/17/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/18/2014