Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 05/07/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/07/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 05/07/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 05/07/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/07/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/07/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/07/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/07/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/07/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/07/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/07/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/07/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/07/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/07/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/07/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/07/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/07/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/07/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/07/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/07/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/07/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/07/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/07/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/07/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/07/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/07/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/07/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 05/07/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/07/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 05/07/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 05/07/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/07/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/07/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/07/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/07/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/08/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/08/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/08/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/08/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/08/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/08/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/08/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/08/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/08/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 05/08/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 05/08/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/08/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/08/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 05/08/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/08/2014
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 05/08/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/08/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/08/2014
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/08/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/08/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/08/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/08/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/08/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/08/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/08/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/08/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/08/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/08/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/08/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 05/08/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/08/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/08/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 05/08/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/08/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/08/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/08/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/08/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 05/08/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/08/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/08/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 05/08/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/08/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 05/08/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/08/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/08/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/09/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/09/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/09/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 05/09/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/09/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 05/09/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/09/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/09/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/09/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/09/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/13/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/13/2014
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/13/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/13/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 05/13/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/13/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/13/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/13/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 05/13/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/13/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/19/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/19/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/19/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/19/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/19/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 05/19/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/20/2014