Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/08/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/08/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 05/08/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 05/08/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/08/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/08/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 05/08/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/09/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/09/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/09/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/13/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 05/15/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/15/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/15/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/20/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/20/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/20/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/20/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/20/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 05/20/2014