Text: H.Res.583 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/13/2014)

 
[Congressional Bills 113th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H. Res. 583 Introduced in House (IH)]

113th CONGRESS
  2d Session
H. RES. 583

     Honoring the vital role of small business and the passion of 
  entrepreneurs in the United States during ``National Small Business 
           Week'', beginning on May 12, through May 16, 2014.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                              May 13, 2014

Mr. Gosar (for himself, Mr. Cardenas, Ms. Brown of Florida, Mr. Tipton, 
    Ms. Matsui, Mr. Pocan, Mr. Kilmer, Mrs. Miller of Michigan, Mr. 
 Simpson, Mr. Chabot, Ms. Shea-Porter, Mr. Kelly of Pennsylvania, Mr. 
 Enyart, Mr. Benishek, Mrs. Negrete McLeod, Ms. McCollum, Mr. Veasey, 
   Ms. Titus, Mr. Costa, Ms. Tsongas, Mr. LaMalfa, Mr. Takano, Mrs. 
 Walorski, Mr. Owens, Ms. Eshoo, Mr. Garcia, Mr. Salmon, Mr. Carson of 
 Indiana, Ms. DelBene, Mr. Lowenthal, Mr. Swalwell of California, Ms. 
Jackson Lee, Mr. Bentivolio, Ms. Bordallo, Mr. Hinojosa, Mr. Schneider, 
 Mr. Collins of New York, Ms. Chu, Mrs. Bustos, Mr. Michaud, Ms. Esty, 
   Mr. Gallego, Mr. Joyce, and Mr. Loebsack) submitted the following 
   resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Small Business

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
     Honoring the vital role of small business and the passion of 
  entrepreneurs in the United States during ``National Small Business 
           Week'', beginning on May 12, through May 16, 2014.

Whereas this year marks the 51st anniversary of ``National Small Business Week'' 
        and has been endorsed by every President since 1963;
Whereas for the first time in its history four cities, including San Francisco, 
        Kansas City, Boston, and Washington, DC, will host speakers and events 
        celebrating National Small Business Week;
Whereas the approximately 28,000,000 small businesses in the United States, 
        which are the leading force behind the United States economy, creating 
        nearly 7 out of every 10 new jobs and generating close to 50 percent of 
        the Nation's nonfarm gross domestic product;
Whereas small firms accounted for 63 percent of net new jobs created between 
        1993 and mid-2013, and since the end of the recession small firms 
        accounted for 60 percent of the net new jobs;
Whereas 22,000,000 small businesses are nonemployer sole proprietorship firms;
Whereas 2,450,000 veterans are small business owners and account for 9.1 percent 
        of all United States businesses;
Whereas woman owned firms have increased as a share of total businesses and 
        include over 7,800,000 small businesses;
Whereas small businesses employ 48.5 percent of the country's private workforce;
Whereas small businesses represent 37 percent of high-tech employment;
Whereas small businesses produce 16 times more patents per employee than large 
        patenting firms;
Whereas small businesses represent 98 percent of all exporters and produce 33 
        percent of exported goods;
Whereas on July 30, 1953, Congress created the Small Business Administration to 
        aid, counsel, assist, and protect the interests of small businesses in 
        order to preserve free and competitive enterprise, to ensure that a fair 
        proportion of the total sales of government property are made to small 
        businesses, and to maintain and strengthen the overall economy of the 
        United States;
Whereas for more than 50 years, the Small Business Administration has helped 
        over 10,000,000 entrepreneurs reach the American dream of creating and 
        maintaining a small business, and has played a key role in fostering 
        local and national economic growth; and
Whereas the President has designated the week beginning May 12, 2014, as 
        ``National Small Business Week'': Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives--
            (1) honors the vital role of small business and 
        entrepreneurs in the United States during ``National Small 
        Business Week'';
            (2) supports the designation of ``National Small Business 
        Week'';
            (3) recognizes the important role of the Small Business 
        Administration as a valuable resource for the United States 
        entrepreneur;
            (4) supports and encourages young entrepreneurs to pursue 
        their passions and create more start-up businesses;
            (5) recognizes the importance of creating policies that 
        promote a business friendly environment for small business 
        owners free of unnecessary and burdensome regulations and red 
        tape;
            (6) recognizes the National Small Business Person of the 
        Year and the National Lender of the Year; and
            (7) supports efforts to--
                    (A) encourage consumers to shop locally; and
                    (B) increase awareness of the value of locally 
                owned small businesses and the impact of locally owned 
                small business on the economy of the United States.
                                 <all>