Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/19/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/19/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/19/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/19/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/28/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/28/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 05/28/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/28/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/28/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/28/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/18/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/18/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/18/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/18/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/18/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/18/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 06/23/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/23/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/25/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/25/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/25/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 06/25/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/25/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/25/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 06/25/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/25/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/25/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/26/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/26/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/26/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/26/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/30/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/07/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/07/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/07/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/07/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/07/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/08/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/08/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/08/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/08/2014