Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/28/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 05/28/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/18/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 06/25/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/26/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/30/2014