Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/28/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/28/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/18/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/07/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/08/2014