Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/19/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/19/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/28/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 05/28/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/28/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/28/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/18/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/18/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/18/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 06/23/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/25/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 06/25/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/25/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/25/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/25/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/25/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/26/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/26/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/30/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/07/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/07/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/07/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/08/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/08/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/08/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/08/2014