Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/23/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/28/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/28/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/29/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/12/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/18/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/09/2014