There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Condemning the death sentence against Meriam Yahia Ibrahim Ishag, a Sudanese Christian woman accused of apostasy.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/28/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
07/21/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
07/21/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
06/10/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations.
05/28/2014Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/28/2014Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/28/2014Introduced in House

Cosponsors (81)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/30/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 05/30/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 05/30/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/30/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/30/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 05/30/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/30/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/30/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/30/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 05/30/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/30/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/30/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/30/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/30/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/30/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/30/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/30/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/30/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/05/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/05/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/05/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 06/05/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/05/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/05/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/05/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/05/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/05/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/05/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/05/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/05/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/05/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/05/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/05/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/05/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/05/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/05/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/05/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/12/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/12/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/12/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/12/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/12/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/12/2014
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/12/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/12/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/12/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/12/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/12/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/12/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/12/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/19/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/19/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/19/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 06/19/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/19/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 06/24/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/24/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/24/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/24/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/25/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/25/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/09/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 07/09/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 07/09/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/09/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 07/16/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/16/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/31/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 07/31/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs05/28/2014 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations06/10/2014 Referred to
House Judiciary05/28/2014 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security07/21/2014 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice07/21/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.601. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/28/2014)

Condemns the charge of apostasy and adultery of Meriam Yahia Ibrahim Ishag in Sudan and her sentence of 100 lashes and the death penalty.

Calls for the release from prison of Ibrahim, her 20-month-old son, and newborn daughter.

Urges the Department of State and the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to prioritize granting Ibrahim asylum or refugee status.

Encourages U.S. efforts to support religious freedom within Sudan, including by requiring before normalizing relations or lifting certain sanctions that Sudan abide by international standards of freedom of religion or belief.

Recognizes that every individual should have the opportunity to practice his or her religion without fear of discrimination.

Reaffirms the commitment of the United State to end religious discrimination and to pursue policies that guarantee the basic human rights of all individuals.

Encourages the Department of State and the U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID) to continue their support for religious freedom initiatives.