Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 05/28/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/30/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 05/30/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 05/30/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/30/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/30/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 05/30/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/30/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/30/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/30/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 05/30/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/30/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/30/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/30/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/30/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/30/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/30/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/30/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/30/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/05/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/05/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/05/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 06/05/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/05/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/05/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/05/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/05/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/05/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/05/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/05/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/05/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/05/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/05/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/05/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/05/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/05/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/05/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/05/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/12/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/12/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/12/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/12/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/12/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/12/2014
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/12/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/12/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/12/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/12/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/12/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/12/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/12/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/19/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/19/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/19/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 06/19/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/19/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 06/24/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/24/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/24/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/24/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/25/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/25/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/09/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 07/09/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 07/09/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/09/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 07/16/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/16/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/31/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 07/31/2014