Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 05/29/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/30/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/30/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/30/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/02/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 06/02/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/02/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 06/05/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/09/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/09/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/09/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/09/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/11/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/11/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/11/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/17/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/17/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/17/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/17/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/18/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/18/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/23/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/23/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/25/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/25/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/25/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/25/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/25/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/25/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/03/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/22/2014