There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Honoring the life of Jeanne Sobelson Manford for her fierce advocacy on behalf of the lesbian, gay, bisexual and transgender (LGBT) community as they and their allies celebrate Pride month during the month of June, reflect on the progress made towards equality, and remember activists like Jeanne who spent their lives fighting for their rights.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/02/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/21/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
06/02/2014Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
06/02/2014Introduced in House

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 06/02/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/02/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/02/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 06/02/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/09/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/17/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/17/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 09/09/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/02/2014 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice07/21/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.611.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.611. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/02/2014)

Recognizes Jeanne Sobelson Manford as a national hero who advanced the rights of lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender people in the United States.

Commends her for helping to create a more perfect union based on the ideal that all men and women are created equal.