Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 06/11/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 06/11/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 06/17/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/17/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 06/17/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/17/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 06/17/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/19/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/19/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/19/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 06/19/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/19/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/24/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/24/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/24/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/24/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/08/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/08/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/08/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/08/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 07/08/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/08/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/08/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/08/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/08/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 07/09/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/09/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/09/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/09/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/09/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/10/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/14/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/15/2014
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/15/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/22/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/25/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/28/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/28/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/29/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/30/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/30/2014
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 07/30/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/31/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 07/31/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 09/08/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 09/08/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 09/08/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 09/08/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/08/2014
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 09/08/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/08/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 09/09/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 09/10/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 09/10/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/15/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 09/15/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/15/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 09/15/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/16/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/16/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/16/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 09/16/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 09/16/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 09/16/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/17/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/17/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 09/17/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 09/18/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/18/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 09/18/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 09/18/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 09/18/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 11/12/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/12/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/12/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 11/12/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 11/12/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 11/12/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 11/12/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/12/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 11/12/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/12/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 11/12/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/12/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 11/12/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/12/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/12/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 11/12/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 11/12/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 11/12/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 11/12/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 11/12/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 11/12/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 11/12/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 11/12/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 11/12/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 11/12/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 11/12/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 11/12/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 11/12/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/12/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 11/12/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 11/12/2014