Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/11/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/12/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/12/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/12/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/12/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 06/12/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/12/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/12/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/12/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/17/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/17/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/17/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 06/17/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 06/17/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 06/17/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/18/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/18/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/18/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/18/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 06/18/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/19/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/20/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/20/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/20/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 06/23/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/24/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/24/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 06/26/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/03/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/08/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/08/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/10/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/23/2014