Text: H.Res.675 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/17/2014)


113th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. RES. 675


Supporting the Constitutional authority of the Governors of the States of Texas, New Mexico, Arizona, and California to take action to secure the international border of the United States within their States.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

July 17, 2014

Mr. King of Iowa (for himself, Mrs. Bachmann, Mr. Gibbs, Mr. Gohmert, Mr. Bishop of Utah, Mr. Fleming, Mr. Franks of Arizona, Mr. Gingrey of Georgia, Mr. Jones, Mr. LaMalfa, Mr. Lamborn, Mr. Marchant, Mr. McClintock, Mr. Rohrabacher, Mr. Stockman, Mr. Wilson of South Carolina, Mr. Palazzo, Mr. Massie, Mr. Duncan of Tennessee, Mr. Meadows, Mr. Rice of South Carolina, Mr. Duncan of South Carolina, Mr. Weber of Texas, Mr. Burgess, Mr. Smith of Texas, Mr. Posey, and Mr. Yoho) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Armed Services


RESOLUTION

Supporting the Constitutional authority of the Governors of the States of Texas, New Mexico, Arizona, and California to take action to secure the international border of the United States within their States.

    Whereas the crisis on the Southwest international border of the United States is of such significance that it demands national attention and urgent action;

    Whereas the President, the Secretary of Homeland Security, and the Administration have enacted unconstitutional policies, such as the Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals program and the Morton Memos, that have contributed significantly to a massive increase in illegal immigration;

    Whereas the President has not secured the Southwest international border of the United States;

    Whereas the President has failed to fulfill his Constitutional obligation to protect each State against invasion in accordance with article IV, section 4 of the Constitution;

    Whereas States have specific authorities for self-defense under article I, section 10, clause 3 of the Constitution when “actually invaded, or in such imminent Danger as will not admit of delay”;

    Whereas, according to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, between October 1, 2013, and June 15, 2014, 52,193 unaccompanied children were apprehended on the Southwest border;

    Whereas, according to a June 3, 2014, Homeland Security Intelligence report, only 0.1 percent of illegal alien, unaccompanied minor children from non-contiguous countries were removed from the United States during fiscal year 2013;

    Whereas the Secretary of Homeland Security expects 90,000 unaccompanied alien children to be interdicted by the U.S. Government while crossing the border in fiscal year 2014;

    Whereas, according to the Department of Homeland Security, only 20 percent of all persons interdicted are and will be children;

    Whereas border security officials estimate the interdiction ratio is 25 percent of those attempting to cross the border;

    Whereas according to border security official’s testimony before Congress, the likely number of illegal crossing attempts is four times the number of those interdicted;

    Whereas the Southern border is not secure, and this border insecurity represents an immediate danger to every citizen of the United States; and

    Whereas the Governor of a State is the commander-in-chief of the National Guard of that State: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the House of Representatives—

(1) recognizes, supports, and defends the Constitutional authority of the Governors of the States of Texas, New Mexico, Arizona, and California to deploy units of the National Guard under the jurisdiction of that Governor to secure the international border of the United States within that State;

(2) urges the Governors of Texas, New Mexico, Arizona, and California to immediately deploy units of the National Guard forces under their jurisdiction to gain effective control of the southern border of the United States, to prevent anyone without legal immigration status from entering the United States, and to ensure for the people of their States and the United States a safe and free future; and

(3) commits to appropriating the necessary monies to effectively support any such deployment of units of National Guard.