Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/14/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 02/26/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/26/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 02/26/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/26/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 02/28/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/11/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/11/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/11/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/11/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/11/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/11/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/18/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/20/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 03/20/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/10/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/10/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/07/2013