Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/26/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/06/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/06/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/12/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/09/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/24/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/25/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/06/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/14/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 06/20/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/28/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 08/02/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/30/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/22/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/23/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/15/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 11/19/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/12/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/23/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/08/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/14/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/12/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/21/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/10/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/01/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/06/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/06/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/20/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 05/21/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/05/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 06/05/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/09/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/18/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 06/23/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/29/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/29/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/31/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 08/01/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/16/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/19/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/13/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 11/19/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/20/2014