Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 03/04/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 03/04/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/04/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/04/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/05/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/12/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/12/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/12/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/19/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/17/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/07/2013