Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/05/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/13/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/13/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/13/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/13/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/30/2013