Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/27/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/05/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/12/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/12/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 03/15/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/14/2013