There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the Committee on Agriculture should not propose any reduction in the availability or amount of benefits provided under the supplemental nutrition assistance program (SNAP) in effect under the Food and Nutrition Act of 2008, and that the House of Representatives should reject any proposed legislation that includes any provisions that reduce the availability or amount of benefits provided under SNAP.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/28/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/13/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, and Nutrition.
03/04/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H820-821)
02/28/2013Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
02/28/2013Introduced in House

Cosponsors (137)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/28/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/13/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/13/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/13/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 03/13/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/13/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 03/13/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/13/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/13/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/13/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 03/13/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/13/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/13/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/13/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/13/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/13/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/14/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 03/14/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 03/14/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/14/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/14/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/15/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/15/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/15/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/18/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/18/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/18/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/18/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/18/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/18/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 03/18/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 03/18/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/18/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/18/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/18/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/18/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/18/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/19/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/19/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/19/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/19/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/19/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/20/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/20/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/20/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/20/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/20/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 03/20/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/10/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/10/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 04/10/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/10/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/10/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/10/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/10/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/10/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/10/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 04/10/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/10/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 04/10/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/10/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/11/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/12/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 04/12/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/15/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 04/15/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/15/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 04/16/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 04/23/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/23/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 04/23/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/23/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/23/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/23/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/23/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 04/23/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 04/26/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/26/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/09/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/09/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/09/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 05/09/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 05/09/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 05/09/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 05/09/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/09/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/21/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 05/21/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 05/21/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/21/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/21/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/21/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 06/03/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/28/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/28/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture02/28/2013 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, and Nutrition03/13/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.90.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.90. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/28/2013)

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that in this Congress the Committee on Agriculture should not propose any reduction in the availability or amount of benefits under the supplemental nutrition assistance program (SNAP) and that the House should reject any proposed legislation that seeks to do so.