Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/15/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/15/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/18/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 03/18/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/20/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/20/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/10/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 04/12/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/23/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/23/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/23/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 04/26/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 05/09/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 05/09/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/28/2013