Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/04/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/12/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 03/12/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/13/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/07/2013