There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for Israel and its right to self-defense against the illegal nuclear program by the Islamic Republic of Iran.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/05/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/05/2013Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
03/05/2013Introduced in House

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/06/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/06/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 03/06/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/07/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/07/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/07/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 03/07/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/07/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 03/07/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/07/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/07/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/07/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/07/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/12/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/15/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/20/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/02/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 12/05/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/08/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/05/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.98.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.98. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/05/2013)

Supports Israel's lawful exercise of self-defense, including actions to stop Iranian aggression such as a strike against Iran's illegal nuclear program.