There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

BTU Act of 2013
Biomass Thermal Utilization Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to include biomass heating appliances for tax credits available for energy-efficient building property and energy property.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/22/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
05/22/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate
05/22/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3763)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/04/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/24/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/24/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/09/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 12/17/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance05/22/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1007. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/22/2013)

Biomass Thermal Utilization Act of 2013 or the BTU Act of 2013 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the tax credit for residential energy efficient property, to make qualified biomass fuel property expenditures eligible for such credit. Defines "qualified biomass fuel property expenditure" as an expenditure for property which uses the burning of biomass fuel (a plant-derived fuel available on a renewable or recurring basis) to heat a dwelling used as a residence, or to heat water for use in such dwelling, and which has a thermal efficiency rating of at least 75%.

Allows an energy tax credit until 2017 for investment in open-loop biomass heating property, including boilers or furnaces which operate at thermal output efficiencies of not less than 65% and provide thermal energy.