Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/04/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/24/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/24/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/09/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 12/17/2013