Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 02/27/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 03/05/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 04/09/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/08/2014